HIGH WEALD SWIFTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 30 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Marie Mason | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Martin Robert Garwood | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Justin Francis Holmes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE COMMON SWIFT, APUS APUS, IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICTS OF TONBRIDGE AND MALLING, TUNBRIDGE WELLS, MAIDSTONE AND WEALDEN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT COMMON SWIFTS AND IN PARTICULAR ABOUT THE RAPID DECLINE IN THE COMMON SWIFT POPULATION, THE CAUSES OF IT AND WHAT CAN BE DONE TO PREVENT FURTHER DECLINE; (2) ENGAGING IN EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS IN SCHOOLS AND OTHER SETTINGS; (3) UNDERTAKING SURVEYS OF NEST SITES; (4) IDENTIFYING AND PROTECTING EXISTING NEST SITES; (5) PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL NEST SITES, INCLUDING BY MAKING GRANTS; (6) PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING GROWTH IN THE POPULATION OF INSECTS, WHICH ARE THE COMMON SWIFT?S FOOD; AND (7) LIAISING WITH HOMEOWNERS AND OTHER LANDOWNERS, LOCAL AUTHORITY PLANNERS, PROPERTY DEVELOPERS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS TO PROMOTE MEASURES TO HELP CONSERVE THE SPECIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 WOODFIELD ROAD
TONBRIDGE
KENT
TN9 2LG
- Phone:
- 01732354161
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window