WITH LOVE EMMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With Love Emma was created to support patients and their families affected by a Brain Tumour diagnosis within England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barclay Creasey | Chair | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Bartley | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lumpkin | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Briony Creasey | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH A BRAIN TUMOUR AND THEIR FAMILIES IN ENGLAND AND WALES, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF 1) GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE 2) GRANTS TO HELP WITH ACCESS TO PRIVATE TREATMENTS/SPECIALIST DOCTORS AND ALTERNATIVE THERAPIES WHICH ARE RECOGNISED BY THE NHS 3) GIFTS AND ACTS OF REMEMBRANCE TO PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Harvest Lane
Lougton
Essex
7 Harvest Lane
Lougton
IG10 4PN
- Phone:
- 07759746996
- Email:
- info@withloveemma.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window