1ST STOCKSFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society. This Group based in Stocksfield and supports young people aged between 6 and 14 as Beavers, Cubs and Scouts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 September 2009: Standard registration
- 1ST STOCKSFIELD BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Hunter | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Meddings | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pitkethly | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Barrass | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Schooler | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.86k | £16.63k | £19.64k | £14.17k | £15.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.43k | £4.13k | £12.01k | £9.41k | £23.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28/03/1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18/02/1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19/07/1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
STOCKSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Scout Hut
Guessburn
Stocksfield
Northumberland
NE43 7QP
- Phone:
- 0345 300 1818
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window