CITY OF NEWCASTLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 03 July 1964: Standard registration
- 30 July 2012: Funds received from 522407 GREAT NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
- NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS' LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DIVISIONAL SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER JOHN AVERY | Chair | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Andrew Skaife | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Hill | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Catherine Amy Barwick | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Coulson | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Loraine Hazel Metcalf | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Tyson | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mercer | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
VIX WALLIS | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GRAHAM BASSETT FCA | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
KATH TYSON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.78k | £105.29k | £126.74k | £101.44k | £146.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.88k | £66.91k | £213.78k | £178.47k | £161.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £69.82k | £29.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/03/1936 DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1961
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Scout House
39 Horsley Avenue
Shiremoor
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE27 0UG
- Phone:
- 07759245751
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window