Financial history 1ST BILSTHORPE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.02k £26.65k £25.26k £23.47k £31.46k
Total expenditure £15.30k £20.98k £16.50k £22.64k £40.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k
Income from government grants N/A £19.39k N/A N/A £2.00k