1ST CALVERTON BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain scout and cub activities and development for the young people of Calverton and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 December 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN TRICIA WALTERS | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ELIZABETH BALL | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUKE TIMOTHY SHAW | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SNUGGS | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROY BALL | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL JOYCE MOSLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £400 | £1.07k | £2.36k | £2.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £800 | £883 | £2.20k | £2.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 4TH JULY 1966
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
CALVERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
297 MAIN STREET
CALVERTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6LT
- Phone:
- 0115 9654442
- Email:
- cheryljmosley@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window