1ST CARLTON-IN-LINDRICK SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting activities for young people aged 6 to 18

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,248
Total expenditure: £22,686

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • 1ST CARLTON-IN-LINDRICK BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD STEPHEN SMITH JP BSc Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CARLTON IN LINDRICK.
Received: On time
Michael Widdop Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Claire Annals Trustee 10 May 2019
None on record
Louise Anderson Trustee 10 May 2019
None on record
Christine Lewis Trustee 01 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CARLTON IN LINDRICK.
Received: On time
Geoffrey Lewis Trustee 01 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CARLTON IN LINDRICK.
Received: On time
LEE ANNALS Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record
MARGARET BECK Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record
TRACY SMEETON Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.77k £31.79k £28.16k £31.68k £18.25k
Total expenditure £22.79k £10.02k £29.21k £29.31k £22.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 SHIRE CLOSE
CARLTON-IN-LINDRICK
WORKSOP
S81 9TJ
Phone:
01909731732
Website:

No information available