5TH MANSFIELD (ST JOHNS PATHFINDERS) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group provides a varied programme of activities covering areas of sport education and training. We follow the scouting principles and try to ensure a safe and secure environment to encourage young people and volunteer leaders to achieve their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 April 1971: Standard registration
- 5TH MANSFIELD (ST JOHN PATHFINDERS SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Passant | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
TONY RAMSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £18.66k | £20.44k | £14.57k | £21.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.10k | £6.31k | £21.35k | £16.01k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED, 1969. LEASE DATED 20TH JANUARY 1967.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
MANSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Greenbank Drive
SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG17 2DY
- Phone:
- 07912629221
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window