REHOBOTH COMMUNITY BASED ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for charity to support children and young people in Nakuru, Kenya to enable us to. Provide school sponsorship to children Build school, health centre and church in Nakuru, Kenya in local community Provide sponsorship to a law student annually via - Kevin Oloo Scholarship fund
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
Governance
- 21 November 2023: CIO registration
- RCBO (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Myers OBE | Chair | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Barbara Nelson | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR ANGELA JOAN ROCHESTER | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||
June Hyatt | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Haughton James | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KENYA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND ITEMS; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN KENYA. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN KENYA BY ESTABLISHING AN EDUCATION CENTRE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PROVISION OF GENERAL EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING. 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN KENYA BY ESTABLISHING A HEALTH CENTRE FOR THE PROVISION OF HEALTH CHECKS, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR VARIOUS COMMON MEDICAL CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCBO
ALPHA HOUSE
ALPHA PLACE
158 Garth Road
MORDEN
SM4 4TQ
- Phone:
- 07956454290
- Email:
- rcbo22@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.