THE CAREGIVERS SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the health of those caring for or nursing people with physical, mental or sensory impairment, within the family or home in South American countries, with particular focus on the Republic of Colombia. In particular but not exclusively assisting in the provision of respite services and other support activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eric Arthur White | Chair | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Arthur Sleigh | Trustee | 28 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Katie Alexandra Roach | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Eyke | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £935 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE CARING FOR OR NURSING PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL, OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME (“CAREGIVERS”) IN SOUTH AMERICAN COUNTRIES, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE REPUBLIC OF COLOMBIA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”), IN PARTICULAR BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESPITE SERVICES AND OTHER SUPPORT ACTIVITIES; AND B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG CAREGIVERS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 LITTLEHAM ROAD
EXMOUTH
EX8 2QH
- Phone:
- 01395225592
- Email:
- caregivers.trust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window