Accounts and annual returns 45TH/89TH NOTTINGHAM (SHERIFF'S OWN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 522447
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 05 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 16 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 18 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted