CORAL CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coral Care gives aid to the poor and needy children of Nepal. It does this by supporting Nepalese charities such as KASIN (Kids at School in Nepal), KIDASHA ( Child Hope), NHCEP (Nepals Helpless Childrens Education Program, CAN (Child Action Nepal) and CRN Child Rescue Nepal. Coral Care raises funds by selling games like Spectro, Detectorwrist and holding sales. We are based in South Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nepal
Governance
- 16 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Ashley Parry | Chair | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Margaret Law | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE ANTHONY BRANCH | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Carolyn Smith | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 July 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 0-18 IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO FUND THE SCHOOL FEES OF THOSE WHO CANNOT AFFORD TO ATTEND AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUITABLY QUALIFIED STAFF AND OTHER MATERIALS NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AGED 0-18 IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 MONMOUTH WAY
BOVERTON
LLANTWIT MAJOR
CF61 2GU
- Phone:
- 07961663632
- Email:
- waparry@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window