FRIENDS OF MILTON MOUNT

Charity Number: 1205518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Education of pupils in the school, in particular by: 3.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. 3.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which supports the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £24,332
Total expenditure: £9,839

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Buchanan Chair 02 April 2025
None on record
Charlotte Earle-Hill Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
Beverlyn Katigbak Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Claire Hammond Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.33k
Total expenditure £9.84k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MILTON MOUNT PRIMARY SCHOOL
GRATTONS DRIVE
CRAWLEY
RH10 3AG
Phone:
01293537158