HOPE AGAINST SUICIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope Against Suicide operates through a team of trained mental health responder's, offering a mobile, face to face listening service- in the busy shopping centre of Bristol by day, and areas for nightlife on an evening. This is to any member of the public grappling with poor mental health who need talk, to be signposted, and offered further advocacy support if required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 08 December 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE MORTON | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Leaman | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Finn | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Smith | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN BRISTOL, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING A NETWORK OF TRAINED VOLUNTEERS WHO ARE ABLE TO OFFER EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN DISTRESS WHERE REQUIRED, IN THE FORM OF TALKING THERAPY AND LISTENING SERVICES, DESIGNED TO PROVIDE INFORMAL EARLY INTERVENTION TO MINIMISE ESCALATION OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AS WELL AS CRISIS INTERVENTION WHERE A MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC IS ALREADY AT CRISIS POINT AND CANNOT KEEP THEMSELVES SAFE. (B) PROVIDING A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO SUPPORT MENTAL HEALTH WELLBEING. (C) TO COLLABORATE WITH OTHER SPECIALIST ORGANISATIONS WHO ASSIST IN THE REDUCTION OF DEATH BY SUICIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Torrance Close
BRISTOL
BS30 5LH
- Phone:
- 07530834552
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.