UNITY4CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the UK we run a food bank which operates based on referrals from local mosques, councils, GPs, Grocery stores and community organisations. We provide emergency food packs to the most needy in the UK . We also work with partner organisations in Pakistan and Bangladesh by sending them grants to further Unity4Care's objects in relieving poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD TAZUL ISLAM | Chair | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ZAHEER AKHTAR | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED KAREEM | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN UK, BANGLADESH AND PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
161 First Floor
Yorkshire Street
Rochdale
OL12 0DR
- Phone:
- 07984398261
- Email:
- info@unity4care.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window