3RD WEST BRIDGFORD (FRIARY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of opportunities for children and young people to learn skills, interact with their peers and develop sound citizenship within the wider community, through the Scouting movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 November 1965: Standard registration
- 3RD WEST BRIDGFORD (FRIARY) BOYSCOUTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Louise Thelwall | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Alan Townsend | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SURRAGE HUBBER | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Yuri Rajabally | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emma Branch | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLIN DAVID HOWARD | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM NIGEL SIDDONS | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marshall | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA MARIA LOUGHRAN | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.58k | £11.87k | £25.25k | £30.27k | £46.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.55k | £11.65k | £18.86k | £27.83k | £33.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NO FORMAL TRUST INSTRUMENT
Charitable objects
UNIT OF BOY SCOUTS
Area of benefit
WEST BRIDGFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Harston Gardens
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7UY
- Phone:
- 07718750914
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window