WOVEN CHURCHES JOINT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1206103
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Woven Churches Joint council operates activities and services for adults, young people, children and families in North West Nottingham

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Timothy Kenneth Atkinson Chair 06 December 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRELLEY ALL SAINTS
Received: On time
Glenys Johnston Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Ian Shipley Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Motunrayo Bukola Ajanaku Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Stephen John Goodings Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Rev Peter Alexander Huxtable Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Rosemary Lilian Walker Trustee 28 February 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRELLEY ALL SAINTS
Received: On time
Rev Emmaline Alice Joanna Walford Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Helen Ballinger Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Karen Lesley Shipley Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Pauline Thomas Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Rev Lydia Corbett Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Simon Nicholas Toplis Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Christine Ann Willis Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Michael Stanley Elliiott Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARGARETS CHURCH
ASPLEY LANE
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 5GE
Phone:
01159298899