ADDERLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADDERLEY VILLAGE HALL PROVIDES A COMMUNITY FACILITY FOR ADDERELY VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING AREA. A NUMBER OF GROUPS MEET REGULARLY, USUALLY WEEKLY, AND THE HALL IS AVAILABLE FOR HIRE ON A ONE OFF BASIS. A LICENSED BAR IS OPEN 3-5 EVENINGS A WEEK. A NUMBER OF EVENTS ARE ORGANISED BY THE TRUSTEES TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE HALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 28 September 1972: Standard registration
- ADDERLEY VILLAGE HALL CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Greetham | Chair | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Gadd | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jameson Clare | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Martin Swindale | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Wrathall | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ICKE | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Kimberly Ann Archer | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Nicholas Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WEAVER | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.90k | £20.13k | £30.55k | £26.64k | £31.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.28k | £9.16k | £11.48k | £15.93k | £19.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ADDERLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHE OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIM OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ADDERLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adderley Village Hall
Adderley
MARKET DRAYTON
Shropshire
TF9 3TF
- Phone:
- 07361791040
- Website:
-
adderleyparish.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window