THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ANDOVER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 September 2023: Standard registration
- 10 July 2024: Funds received from 1154049 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- ANDOVER PARISH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher James Bradish | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Selwood | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elaine Watt | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elizabeth Ball | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Garraway | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob Savill | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Shears | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mary Singleton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hugh Bazire | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hughes | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CHARLES MAY | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Waako | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil John Laws | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Parker | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Bond | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jess Ross | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Bird | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moira Sera Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Ian Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Roberts | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edwin Darkin | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lauren Marie Cheshire | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Claire Warburton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kilian Reimar Dominik Kleine | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Floor
Chantry House
Chantry Way
Andover
Hampshire
SP10 1LZ
- Phone:
- 07719994538
- Email:
- parish@andoverparish.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.