BALANCE OF THE MIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Balance of the mind : A mental health charity supporting individuals dealing with stress, anxiety, panic attacks, depression, as well as relationship issues, trauma, anger management, and everyday work and life stresses. Our therapeutic interventions, such as CBT, talk therapies, and management programs, are tailored to meet unique client needs, promoting activities, healing and personal growth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zachariah Isaac | Chair | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Wasif Hussain | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Addnan Qadir | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, OR THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF DEVELOPING MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING SESSIONS AND SESSIONS WHICH PROVIDE ADVICE, GUIDANCE, PEER TO PEER SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE DESIGNED TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND RECOVERY WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Balance of the mind
Unit 14
Duck Farm Court
Station Way West
AYLESBURY
Buckingh
- Phone:
- 07555429563
- Email:
- Balanceofthemind@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window