NPT PRIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising Neath Port Talbot pride events and encouraging community cohesion and inclusivity
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 08 January 2024: CIO registration
- NEATH PORT TALBOT PRIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Revelle | Chair | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheridan Barrell | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elias Ms | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ravelle | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Cooper-Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Morgan | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Philip Twitchen | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cooper-Smith | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann David | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND QUEER (LGBTQ) PEOPLE; (2) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE ACHIEVEMENTS OF LGBTQ PEOPLE AND THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBTQ COMMUNITY; (3) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY EDUCATION, INTERACTION WITH SCHOOLS, PERFORMANCES OR OTHER ARTICTIC DISPLAYS; (4) PRODUCING LECTURES, MEDIA, PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND EXHIBITIONS; (5) STAGING AND PROMOTING LGBTQ EVENTS AND IN PARTICULAR AN ANNUAL LGBTQ FESTIVAL; (6) PROMOTING AND PROVIDING RESOURCES WHERE NECESSARY FOR PROVIDING EQUALITY OF ACCESS FOR MEMBERS OF THE LGBTQ COMMUNITY TO SPORTS, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND BUSINESS WHERE BARRIERS TO EQUAL ACCESS EXIST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Trinity Cottages
Cwmavon Road
Port Talbot
SA12 8RB
- Phone:
- 07762332141
- Email:
- nptpride@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.