THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE IN THE ISLE OF THANET, RAMSGATE

Charity Number: 1205909
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PCC OF ST LAURENCE-IN-THANET TEAM MINISTRY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kenneth Ian Royston Cox Chair 28 April 2013
None on record
Graham Wesley Robinson Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Penelope Alison Robinson Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Barbara Phyllis Byne Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Judith Ann Andrews Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Zena Penny Barron Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
David Alan Newman Trustee 06 September 2020
None on record
Rev Philip John Barnes Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
Sharon Cutler Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Kevin Michael Spain Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE, 2 NEWINGTON ROAD
RAMSGATE
KENT
CT11 0QT
Phone:
01843592478