Cheswardine Parish Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide the building and facilities for all types of educational and leisure activities and a venue for private parties and wedding receptions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 December 1969: Standard registration
- CHESWARDINE PARISH HALL (Working name)
- CHESWARDINE VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Senior | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Barclay | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Pound | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Bullock | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Stanton | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Allman | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Kershaw | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Rosamund Stanton | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Clare Webb | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joseph Taylor | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Taylor | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harold John Lewis | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Ann Williams | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lynn Hall | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Miss J S Pryce | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr M Hendry | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.38k | £59.63k | £15.51k | £15.33k | £34.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.02k | £46.01k | £22.71k | £30.92k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.13k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH JULY, 1930 as amended on 08 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CHESWARDINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheswardine Parish Hall
Podmore Road
Cheswardine
Market Drayton
Shropshire
TF9 2FA
- Phone:
- 07396730220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window