Financial history Church and Chetwynd Aston Village Hall

Charity Number: 522491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.67k £51.80k £27.54k £24.23k £35.10k
Total expenditure £21.81k £68.71k £45.60k £26.62k £27.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.94k £14.40k £370 N/A