EDUCATE AGAINST ISLAMOPHOBIA (EAI) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educate Against Islamophobia aims to support Early Years settings, primary schools, secondary schools, further education settings and initial teacher education providers across the UK to tackle Islamophobia through delivery of workshops and training sessions and production and dissemination of teaching and learning materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 December 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SULEMAN NASEEM AHMED | Chair | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sajaida Arif | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED IRFAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF ISLAMOPHOBIA, BY MEANS OF BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, -EDUCATING AND RAISING AWARENESS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN EDUCATION SETTINGS OF ISLAMOPHOBIA AND ITS IMPACT ON VICTIMS AND SOCIETY AT LARGE; --PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS IN EDUCATION SETTINGS, PARTICULARLY BETWEEN MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS BY COUNTERING MISCONCEPTIONS OF ISLAM AND MUSLIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 2A
Blackthorn House
Mary Ann Street
BIRMINGHAM
B3 1RL
- Phone:
- 07956186425
- Email:
- info@eai.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.EAI.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window