Earth Architecture Lab
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'earth architecture lab' is committed to the preservation and promotion of earth architecture. By harnessing the timeless wisdom of traditional building techniques and integrating modern innovations, the charity seeks to redefine the narrative surrounding sustainable construction practices with people and in needed places.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Egypt
- France
- India
- Iran
- Iraq
- Italy
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- Oman
- Saudi Arabia
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United Arab Emirates
- Yemen
Governance
- 23 January 2024: Standard registration
- DAWAN ECO ARCH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Murray OBE | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Salma Samar Damluji | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Charles Modlen | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 OCT 2022 as amended on 24 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION THROUGH ADVANCING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE ON MUD AND EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT THROUGH: THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF A STUDY CENTRE FOR EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ARCHIVE TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN AND PROVIDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO MATERIALS RELATING TO EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND OTHER LEADERS IN THE FIELD OF EARTH ARCHITECTURE AND THE BUILT MUD ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL PAPERS, MODELS, DRAWINGS, PLANS, PHOTOGRAPHS, AND OTHER ARTEFACTS. PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO SUPPORT THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF EARTH-BUILT ARCHITECTURE AND ASSOCIATED TRADITIONAL ARTS, ARTEFACTS AND CRAFTS. PROMOTING THE PRACTICE AND IMPLEMENTATION OF EARTH BUILDING AND ARCHITECTURAL RECONSTRUCTION AND RESTORATION OF PROJECTS IN LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 SHELTON STREET
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 07904515359
- Email:
- eartharchlab@gmail.com
- Website:
-
eartharchitecturelab.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.