Trustees COCKSHUTT VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 522502

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hadley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mole | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
EWAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Longhurst | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Joy Harrison | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hankey | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Milns | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILL WEBB | Trustee | 22 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.