SRI SATHYA SAI ORGANISATION UNITED KINGDOM CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 April 2024: CIO registration
- SSSO UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRATAP KANTILAL THAKKAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Saiwarren Pathmanathan | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr SENTHIRU SIVALOGANATHAN | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vasuky Easwaracumar | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SATHISH KUMAR THIRUPADRIPULIYUR MOHAN | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sushma Kumari Gurung | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr (Mrs) Arul Malar Srinivasan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR KETAN RAMESCHANDRA PARMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR SREEBALA SRIPADA MRCOG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYESH PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEEL MAHESH MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Jitesh Kumar Manubhai Patel | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Roni Laxman Singh Ramdin MSci ARCS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sakthitharan Shanmugathasan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANISHA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF THE MORAL OR SPIRITUAL WELFARE OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: (A) DEVELOPING AN INDIVIDUAL’S MORAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPABILITY THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF THE FIVE VALUES OF TRUTH, RIGHT CONDUCT, PEACE, LOVE AND NON-VIOLENCE AS PER THE TEACHINGS OF SRI SATHYA SAI BABA; AND (B) PROVIDING GRANTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT FOR PURPOSES REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Elgood Avenue
Northwood
Middlesex
HA6 3QJ
- Phone:
- 07956338739
- Email:
- info@srisathyasai.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.