SALLYS DUCK RESCUE (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of domestic waterfowl in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide a safe sanctuary for their reception, care and treatment of such animals and to educate the public in matters pertaining to the welfare of domestic waterfowl in general
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 January 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Jones | Chair | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Hemming | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Jones | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Ferguson | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOMESTIC WATERFOWL IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE A SAFE SANCTUARY FOR THEIR RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF DOMESTIC WATERFOWL IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Smeeth Road
Marshland St James
PE14 8JF
- Phone:
- 07846833398
- Email:
- sallysduckrescue@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.