ERCALL MAGNA, PAYTON RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Sports and Recreation activities for children and all local inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 28 August 1963: Standard registration
- High Ercall Village Hall and Playing Fields (Working name)
- HIGH ERCALL VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Noyes Thomas | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Grant | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harrison | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Harrison | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Grant | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fancett | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR A WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAY WICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.21k | £28.88k | £43.18k | £46.94k | £37.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.96k | £8.16k | £28.20k | £44.14k | £36.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.14k | £11.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13TH JULY 1966. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 OCTOBER 1996.
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ERCALL MAGNA AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THOSE RESIDENT IN THE VILLAGE OF HIGH ERCALL, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Ercall Village Hall
Park Lane
High Ercall
Telford
Shropshire
TF6 6BB
- Phone:
- 01952 770377
- Email:
- info.hevh@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window