READ EASY HARLOW AND CHELMSFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 25 September 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Fillary | Chair | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Denise Hogg | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hewett | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gell | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Shardlow | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Pountney | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ADULT PUBLIC IN LITERACY WITHIN THE HARLOW AND CHELMSFORD (GEOGRAPHICAL) AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 HANGING HILL LANE
HUTTON
BRENTWOOD
CM13 2HS
- Phone:
- 01388435021
- Email:
- hctreasurer@readeasy.org.uk
- Website:
-
readeasy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window