FITZ VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Venue for local groups - Choir; Craft Group; Yoga; Senior Citizens Friendship group; Band practice; Flower Group. Events - Coffee mornings; Fayres; Floral Art dems; community social events Adult Education classes - various Polling station Private parties Parish Council meeting - 2 per year Local Councillors surgery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 22 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TOM KAYE | Chair | 18 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jayne Selman | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Worsley | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Arnold Briers | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie KAYE | Trustee | 09 March 1993 |
|
|
||||
ANN MALPASS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MALPASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.72k | £19.99k | £19.00k | £6.55k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.07k | £12.10k | £4.50k | £2.38k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21ST DECEMBER 1931
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS THE PARISH OF FITZ AND THE HAMLETS OF BROMLEY FORGE,FORTON HEATH AND BROOMFIELD IN THE PARISH OF MONTFORD,AND THE HAMLET OF YEATON PEVEREY IN THE PARISH OF BASCHURCH
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
MYTTON COTTAGE
MYTTON
MONTFORD BRIDGE
SHREWSBURY
SY4 1EU
- Phone:
- 01743850722
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window