MILTON KEYNES BUDDHIST ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running talks on Buddhism classes and chanting sessions at a hired community hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judy Chui Chu Lam | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mei Wan | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
YEANG YEANG YEE | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, WHICH MAY INCLUDE, BUT ARE NOT RESTRICTED TO, THE FOLLOWING: A) THE TEACHING, STUDY, OR PRACTICE OF THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BUDDHIST FAITH AND B) THE PROVISION OF A LEARNING CENTRE OR OTHER PLACE FOR BUDDHISM EDUCATION AND C) THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS AND/OR PUBLIC EVENTS AND D) PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AND E) TO MAINTAIN CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORK IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OR SIMILAR OBJECTS AND/OR TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY BY ENHANCING MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AMONG ALL RACES AND CULTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Milton Road
Broughton
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 9LR
- Phone:
- 07999872161
- Email:
- mkbuddhist@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window