GLORY AND POWER PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1204439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding of prayer meetings and lectures which are meant to advance the Christian religion Providing assistance to members who are in various kinds of needs and the community at large Celebration of Christian Religious Festivals. Involved in General Charitable deeds

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,428
Total expenditure: £5,008

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Owusu Ansah Chair 04 May 2023
None on record
Dugbah Manor Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Nana Ama Kyeafi Trustee 04 May 2023
HEART OF PRAYER MINISTRY
Received: On time
Juliana Tetteh Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.43k
Total expenditure £5.01k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Globa harvest ministries
100-114 Loampit Vale
LONDON
SE13 7SN
Phone:
07507593737
Website:

No information available