UNMASK CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Unmask Cancer aims to fundraise and organise events to raise awareness around cancer. Any funding is used to provide Chemo-Kits to patients, counselling from a professional on our team to patients and their families, and soon provide financial support towards travel, wigs and bras. We want everyone to enjoy events with us, whilst raising money to help those affected by a cancer diagnosisis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Andrews | Chair | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Milan Kane | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Casey-Lee Kane | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raissa McSkimming | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Krystle Buck | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McKay | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hope Simmons | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT FOR CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS TO ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH, EASE THEIR SUFFERING AND/OR RECOVERY AND/OR PROVIDE COMFORT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CHEMOTHERAPY RELIEF BOXES WHICH CONTAIN ITEMS WHICH HELP AND ASSIST IN THE PERSONAL CARE WHEN DEALING WITH THE SIDE EFFECTS OF CHEMOTHERAPY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 GLAZEBROOK CLOSE
LONDON
66 Glazebrook Close
west dulwich
SE21 8RR
- Phone:
- 07699006988
- Email:
- info@unmaskcancer.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window