LLANFAIRWATERDINE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a physical resource for community groups and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 01 March 1965: Standard registration
- EVEREST HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iorwerth Waters | Chair | 03 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
James David McLoughlin | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Thomas | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wood | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Waters | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilding | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kenyon | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David John Morgan | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bufton | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Harroway | Trustee | 01 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibbs | Trustee | 03 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
GILBERT LLEWELYN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH MARY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.85k | £18.87k | £6.94k | £5.95k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £16.19k | £5.27k | £6.44k | £5.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JULY 1963
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LLANFAIR WATERDINE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Melin y Grogue Mill
Llanfairwaterdine
Knighton
LD7 1TU
- Phone:
- 01547510285
- Email:
- marybufton@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window