THE FRIENDS OF KIRK THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 December 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Anne Arksey | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Trevor Robinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Luke James Arnold | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Caroline Elizabeth Donna Brown | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING SUCH GRANTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE IN SUPPORT OF THE WORK AND RUNNING OF KIRK THEATRE PICKERING. [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.].
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIRK THEATRE
HUNGATE
PICKERING
YO18 7DL
- Phone:
- 01751474833
- Email:
- friends@kirktheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window