THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S HILLFIELDS COVENTRY

Charity number: 1206664
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Peter's Hillfields works to promote the whole mission of Church in the context of the above Parish through both Word (preaching, worship, teaching, etc) and Action for the primary benefit of the people of Hillfields and the Coventry refugee and asylum seeker community to whom we offer help and support without making any distinction.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S HILLFIELDS PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Matthew Adam Spina Chair 30 November 2021
None on record
Taiwo Olayiwola Fakeye Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Erskine Howell Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Frederick Kratt Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Jo-Ann Eudora Perry-Straker Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Dr Eunice Oluwakemi Chukwuma-Nwuba Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Rev Philip John Atkinson PhD Trustee 18 November 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, COVENTRY
Received: On time
Joseph Dash Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
Jane Christine Clark Trustee 09 April 2017
None on record
Dorothy May Senior Trustee 20 March 2016
None on record
Brenda Critchley Trustee 29 March 2015
None on record
John Wesley Bourne Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
JOHN MCCOACH Trustee 09 April 2006
1 JOHN 3:17-18 BEIRA
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
St Peter's Hillfields Church
Charles Street
Hillfields
Coventry
West Midlands
CV1 5NP
Phone:
02476632877