PREES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522560
Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide facilities for use by the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £4,025
Total expenditure: £2,454

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Ladd Chair 28 March 2017
None on record
Karen Sieloff Trustee 29 January 2019
None on record
David Jones Trustee 28 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £5.29k £4.09k £1.72k £1.18k £4.03k
Total expenditure £11.52k £5.80k £3.90k £4.27k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 April 2023 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 January 2022 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Prees Village Hall
Church Street
Prees
WHITCHURCH
Shropshire
SY13 2DQ
Phone:
01948841495
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available