PRESTON BROCKHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDE ACTIVITES/SPORTS FOR LOCAL PEOPLE,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,127
Total expenditure: £5,290

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID ANDREW EMBREY Chair
None on record
MATTHEW JOHN JONES Trustee 30 October 2012
None on record
JULIA ANNE JONES Trustee 30 October 2012
None on record
SARAH JANE GROVE Trustee
None on record
PIP HIGGINS Trustee
None on record
IRENE HAWES Trustee
None on record
PHIL HIGGINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.40k £11.16k £2.92k £3.66k £4.13k
Total expenditure £5.37k £8.41k £7.19k £5.80k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Preston Brockhurst Village Hall
Preston Brockhurst
Shrewsbury
Shropshire
SY4 5QA
Phone:
01743272144
Website:

No information available