MISSION CARE MANAGEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing nursing and residential care to vulnerable adults
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 23 November 2023: Standard registration
- MISSION CARE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY THOMAS DEAN | Chair | 12 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Jones | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Andrew Maclean Surgenor | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF SOUTHWARK, LEWISHAM, GREENWICH, BROMLEY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, AND WHICH SHALL BE CARRIED OUT AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE BELIEFS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED AS AN APPENDIX TO THESE ARTICLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MISSION CARE
LANGFORD HOUSE
7-7A HIGH STREET
CHISLEHURST
BR7 5AB
- Phone:
- 03031233201
- Email:
- enquiries@missioncare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.