Trustees CALISEN IMPACT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1206963
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillip Alexander McLelland Chair 22 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Blackburn Trustee 07 March 2025
None on record
Clement Lapeyre Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
David James Forshaw Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Chloe Rebecca Fearn-Rice Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Sarah Lucy Lord Trustee 29 August 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Claire Smallman Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record