GLOBAL AID NETWORK UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Haiti
- Romania
- South Africa
Governance
- 15 December 2023: Standard registration
- GAIN UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Nicholas Devas | Chair | 13 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Lesley Allison Cheesman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Klaus Herbert Dewald | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
AS AN OUTWORKING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THE OBJECTS ARE:- - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; AND - THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167 Newhall Street
Birmingham
West Midlands
B3 1SW
- Phone:
- 01217654404
- Email:
- info@globalaidnetwrok.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window