TREFONEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the provision and maintenance of a village hall for use by the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a) meetings, lectures and classes, and (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 June 1963: Standard registration
- TREFONEN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- TREFONEN AND SYCHTYN PARISH HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB KIMBER | Chair | 09 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL FERGUSSON | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY HERRINGTON-JONES | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS C PICKERING | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR J WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR J R HUGHES | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS V SMOUT | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS D HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.42k | £357 | £5.97k | £10.03k | £13.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.27k | £4.85k | £7.29k | £10.84k | £10.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 1 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS TREFONEN AND THE HAMLET OF SYCHTYN AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fallow Fields
Rectory Close
Trefonen
Oswestry
SY10 9FF
- Phone:
- 01691679646
- Email:
- bobnkkimber@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
no.website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window