THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL'S GREYSTONES, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1205179
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship. Promotion of Christianity and the whole mission of the Church. Supporting other charities.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST GABRIEL'S CHURCH GREYSTONES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Alistair Philip Stevenson Chair 01 December 2018
None on record
Stephen Thomas Pendlebury Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Thomas Janzen Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Peter James Gaunt Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Linda Darby Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Martha Dewey Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Pauline Mary Smithers Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Bailey Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
ROGER KENNETH DYSON Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Stephen Thomas Dewey Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
Martin Clow Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
Howard Vaughan Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
Peter Andrew Smithers Trustee 25 September 2010
None on record
Linda Chambers Trustee 01 April 2007
SHEFFIELD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Dobbin Hill
Sheffield
S11 7JB
Phone:
07704672166