PLAYING FOR CAKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playing for Cake delivers fun, interactive and participatory community-based singing, music-making and other creative opportunities for all ages and abilities in accessible locations in Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Philip Noel Grieve | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tina Blaber | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Cooke | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Fisher | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Claxton | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES PRIMARILY IN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) NORTH NORFOLK BY PROVIDING COMMUNITY SINGING, MUSIC-MAKING AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE PROVEN MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING BENEFITS AND, BY EXTENSION, PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR FAMILY, FRIENDS AND CARERS, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ONLINE RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Alexandra Road
SHERINGHAM
NR26 8HU
- Phone:
- 07771605188
- Email:
- info@playingforcake.uk
- Website:
-
playingforcake.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window