WESTON RHYN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of Recreation Ground and landowner of Land at Lower Quinta Park let to a local farmer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 29 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Norman Bavin | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip Barnett | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Wallace | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Herbert | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Manley | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rowlands | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Weston Rhyn Parish Council | Trustee | 01 January 1950 |
|
|
||||
John Alwyn Hughes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07k | £1.71k | £12.85k | £42.33k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £1.70k | £2.54k | £46.48k | £26.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.50k | £4.10k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 300 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH OCTOBER 1929 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 21 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF WESTON RHYN, ST. MARTIN'S SELATTYN AND GOBOWEN AND WHITTINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND THE PARISHES OF CHIRK AND GLYN TRAIAN, IN THE COUNTY OF CLWYD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Weston Rhyn Trust
PO Box 2458
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL11 0RH
- Phone:
- 07903119412
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window