Trustees WORFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522590

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHRISTOPHER LEARY | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LEARY | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Barry Sedgwick | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Baylis | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Cowern | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee-Ann Constentinou | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.