WROCKWARDINE WOOD RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wrockwardine Wood Football Club Wrockwardine Wood Bowling Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 14 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN GAUT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP CLEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14 | £14 | £14 | £14 | £14 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1300 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1300 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 13 OCTOBER 1922
Charitable objects
PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF OAKENGATES
Contact information
- Address:
-
104a Trench Road
Trench
Telford
TF2 7DW
- Phone:
- 01952677710
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window