ALDRIDGE CENTRAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BALANCE CLASS, DANCE-TEACHING & SOCIAL, ART CLASSES, EXERCISE - TAI CHI , YOGA, PILATES, FITNESS CHILDRENS BALLET, DANCE & CRAFT, KIDDIBOP, BRIDGE, U3A MEETINGS, INC. FRENCH, BRIDGE, RUMMIKUB, WHIST, PHOTOGRAPHY, NHS BLOOD COLLECTION, UKULELE,CRAFTING, MACHINE KNITTING, SLIMMING WORLD , LINK & FILLING STATION CHURCH MTGS, WAL SPINNERS, IAMS, SOCIAL GATHERING FOR LONELINESS/DEMENTIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 22 December 1967: Standard registration
- ACCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Smith | Chair | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Hipkiss | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Turner | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Fairey | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.22k | £32.21k | £92.06k | £78.39k | £97.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.08k | £39.13k | £75.66k | £101.76k | £99.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £23.86k | £19.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
ALDRIDGE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALDRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE
MIDDLEMORE LANE
ALDRIDGE
WALSALL
WS9 8AN
- Phone:
- 01922454337
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window